Mortgages

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0182Prince George's County - Vacant and Abandoned Residential Property - Foreclosure PG 404-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0187 / CH0479
    (SB0006)
Financial Institutions – Nondepository Special Fund – ExpansionChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 479Economic Matters
1/24/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
HB0266Condominiums - Lien Priority - Unpaid Water and Sewer ChargesDelegate ReyIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0279 / CH0104Housing and Community Development - Homebuyer Education RequirementsChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 104Environment and Transportation
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0408 / CH0539Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Connection Pipe Emergency Replacement Loan Program PG/MC 103-18Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 539Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
HB1007
    (SB0883)
Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and RulesDelegate CullisonIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1240Assisted Housing Preservation Act - Assisted Projects, Protected Actions, and Duties of the Department of Housing and Community DevelopmentDelegate LaffertyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1297 / CH0790Commercial Law - Consumer Loans and Credit - Miscellaneous ProvisionsDelegate AumannApproved by the Governor - Chapter 790Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)
HB1511 / CH0844Credit Regulation - Mortgage Brokers - Finder's FeeDelegate MautzEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 844Economic Matters
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)
HB1634 / CH0731
    (SB1068 / CH0732)
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018Delegate FrickApproved by the Governor - Chapter 731Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0006
    (HB0187 / CH0479)
Financial Institutions - Nondepository Special Fund - ExpansionChair, Finance CommitteeIn the House - First Reading Economic MattersFinance
1/17/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic MattersFinancial Institutions (I1)
SB0216Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Priority of Liens - Included ChargesSenator NormanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0566 / CH0845Credit Regulation - Mortgage Brokers - Finder's FeeSenator SerafiniEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 845Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)
SB0755 / CH0340Credit Regulation - Escrow Accounts - Water and Sewer Facilities AssessmentsSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 340Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)
SB0883
    (HB1007)
Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and RulesSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB1068 / CH0732
    (HB1634 / CH0731)
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018Senator RosapepeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 732Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:03 P.M.