Morticians

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0593
    (SB0415 / CH0497)
Morticians and Funeral Directors - Pre-Need ContractsDelegate KrebsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Health Occupations (J2)
HB1031
    (SB0586 / CH0308)
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments - Unannounced InspectionsDelegate AndersonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Health Occupations (J2)
HB1042
    (SB0648 / CH0322)
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments Owned by a Single Owner - Pre-Need Trustee Licenses and Public Notification of DeathDelegate AndersonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Health Occupations (J2)
HB1239
    (SB0775)
Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Pre-Need Contracts and Unclaimed Cremains - Reporting and Audit RequirementsDelegate CullisonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1264
    (SB0121)
Public Safety - Removal of Dead Bodies - Police PresenceDelegate SwainIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1456 / CH0457Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - JurisdictionChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 457Health and Government Operations
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1466Morticians and Funeral Directors - Contracts - Statement Regarding Availability of Internal Organs for BurialDelegate ConawayIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Health Occupations (J2)
SB0121
    (HB1264)
Public Safety - Removal of Dead Bodies - Police PresenceSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0415 / CH0497
    (HB0593)
Morticians and Funeral Directors - Pre-Need ContractsSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 497Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0586 / CH0308
    (HB1031)
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments - Unannounced InspectionsSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 308Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0648 / CH0322
    (HB1042)
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments Owned by a Single Owner - Pre-Need Trustee Licenses and Public Notification of DeathSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 322Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0775
    (HB1239)
Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Pre-Need Contracts and Unclaimed Cremains - Reporting and Audit RequirementsSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Health Occupations (J2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.