Motorcycles and Motor Scooters

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0003Motor Vehicles - Mopeds and Motor Scooters - Valid Drivers' Licenses or PermitsDelegate BeidleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0374
    (SB0212 / CH0206)
Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates for Motorcycles - Individuals with DisabilitiesDelegate MaloneVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0430 / CH0371Criminal Law - Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption and Possession in Motor VehiclesChair, Judiciary CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 371Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0445Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road - Overtaking Another VehicleDelegate CardinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0500Vehicle Laws - Motorcycles - Expiration of Learner's Instructional PermitDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0523 / CH0484
    (SB0486 / CH0483)
Short-Term Rental of Motorcycles - Sales and Use Tax and Motor Vehicle LawDelegate MyersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 484Environmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB1179
    (SB0472)
Vehicle Laws - Motor Scooters and Mopeds - Special Dealer DecalsDelegate ConwayIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)Environmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0212 / CH0206
    (HB0374)
Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates for Motorcycles - Individuals with DisabilitiesSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 206Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0246Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - ExceptionSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0472
    (HB1179)
Worcester County - Motor Scooters and Mopeds - Special Dealer DecalsSenator MathiasIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0486 / CH0483
    (HB0523 / CH0484)
Short-Term Rental of Motorcycles - Sales and Use Tax and Motor Vehicle LawSenator BrinkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 483Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.