Motorcycles, Mopeds and Motor Scooters

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0013Vehicle Laws - Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operator's Permits - Indication of Applicant's SexDelegate RobinsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0060Vehicle Laws - Electric Personal Assistive Mobility Device - DefinitionDelegate LamIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0139Public Safety - Emergency Medical Services - Motorcycle Response UnitDelegate KnottsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0142Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Road User - PenaltiesDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0293Vehicle Laws - Mopeds and Motor Scooters - Protective HeadgearDelegate WivellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1091
    (SB1030)
Off-Highway Recreational Vehicle Fund - EstablishmentDelegate FoldenIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/9/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1099
    (SB0868)
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - PenaltiesDelegate LaffertyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1586 / CH0088
    (SB0355 / CH0087)
Wicomico County - Motorcycles - Sunday SalesDelegate AndertonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 88Economic Matters
3/12/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0355 / CH0087
    (HB1586 / CH0088)
Wicomico County - Motorcycles - Sunday SalesSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 87Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0439Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - ExceptionSenator NormanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0606 / CH0700Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles - Excise Titling Tax - Off-Highway Recreational Vehicle Trail FundSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 700Budget and Taxation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0868
    (HB1099)
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Road User - PenaltiesSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB1030
    (HB1091)
Off–Highway Recreational Vehicle Fund – EstablishmentSenator HoughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 18, 2018 4:11 P.M.