Motor Vehicle Administration

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 32

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0077Vehicle Laws - Single Registration Plate - Class L (Historic) Vehicles and Class N (Street Rod) VehiclesDelegate McMillanIn the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0088
    (SB0281)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Selective Service Registration - Driver's License and Identification Card ApplicantsDelegate SchuhIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0095Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plate - United States Armed ForcesDelegate SmigielIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0130
    (SB0153 / CH0041)
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Task Force to Study Methods to Reduce the Rate of Uninsured DriversDelegate RudolphVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0290Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, Factory Branches, and Affiliates - Relationship With DealersDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0327Vehicle Laws - Single Registration PlateDelegate ElliottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0529
    (SB0813 / CH0343)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Drivers' Licenses and Identification Cards - Organ Donor DesignationDelegate MaloneVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0682
    (SB0545)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Records - ExpungementDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)Environmental Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0941
    (SB0536)
Vehicle Laws - Motor Vehicle Commission - EstablishmentDelegate SchuhIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0999 / CH0106Code Revision - Miscellaneous ProvisionsSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 106Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB1120
    (SB0387)
Drivers' Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operators' Permits - Enhanced Identification DocumentsDelegate GeorgeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1190Vehicle Laws - Licenses and Registrations - Notice of Suspension or RevocationDelegate McMillanIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1286
    (SB0777)
Driver's Education - Income Tax Credit - Assessment of Fees for Driving OffensesDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB1339
    (SB0807)
Drivers' Licenses - Disorder, Disease, or Physical Disability - Defining and ReportingDelegate SteinIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1354Motor Vehicle Administration - Multiple Copies of Driving Records - FeesDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB1421Vehicle Laws - Motorcycles - Learners' Instructional PermitsDelegate GlassIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1423Vehicle Laws - Motorcycles - Learners' Instructional PermitsDelegate GlassIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0004Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Appalachian TrailSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0026 / CH0005Motor Vehicles - Commercial Instructional Permit Holders - Administrative Penalties and ProceduresChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 5Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0077 / CH0014Vehicle Laws - Commercial and Farm Vehicles - Safety Inspections and Utility EmergenciesChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 14Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0087 / CH0017Drunk Driving - Ignition Interlock System Program - Repeat OffendersChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 17Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
SB0153 / CH0041
    (HB0130)
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Task Force to Study Methods to Reduce the Rate of Uninsured DriversSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 41Finance
1/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0241Rules of the Road - Duty to Remain at Scene of Accident - Driver Education and PenaltiesSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0281
    (HB0088)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Selective Service Registration - Driver's License and Identification Card ApplicantsSenator AstleIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0387
    (HB1120)
Drivers' Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operators' Permits - Enhanced Identification DocumentsSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0536
    (HB0941)
Vehicle Laws - Motor Vehicle Commission - EstablishmentSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0545
    (HB0682)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Records - ExpungementSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0629Counties and Municipalities - Vehicle Registration Fee SurchargeSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0773Automated Motor Vehicles - Titling, Registration, and Rules of the RoadSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0777
    (HB1286)
Driver's Education - Income Tax Credit - Assessment of Fees for Driving OffensesSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
SB0807
    (HB1339)
Drivers' Licenses - Disorder, Disease, or Physical Disability - Identification, Disclosure, and ReportingSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0813 / CH0343
    (HB0529)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Drivers' Licenses and Identification Cards - Organ Donor DesignationSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 343Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.