Motor Vehicle Administration

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 30

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0031Motor Vehicle Administration - Public Records Inspections - Young PersonsDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
1/26/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0244
    (SB1163)
Motor Vehicles - Duplicate Drivers' Licenses - Victims of RobberyDelegate FennellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0343Motor Vehicles - Special Deafness Registration PlateDelegate AngelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0492 / CH0684Vehicle Laws - Certificate of Title - Transfer-on-Death Beneficiary DesignationDelegate CarrApproved by the Governor - Chapter 684Environment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0532
    (SB1133)
Election Law - Qualification of Voters - Proof of IdentityDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0563Vehicle Laws - Provisional Drivers' Licenses - IssuanceDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0648
    (SB0057 / CH0502)
Income Tax Credit - Class F Vehicles - Modification and ExtensionDelegate HixsonIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationWays and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0969Suspension of Driving Privileges - Dispensing Motor Fuel Into Dirt BikeDelegate ConawayIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB1013
    (SB0902)
Vehicle Laws - Safe Autonomous Vehicle (SAVE) ActDelegate McCrayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1017 / CH0717Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Records - ExpungementChair, Judiciary CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 717Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1071 / CH0702Vehicle Laws - Victim's Representative Notification - License Suspension HearingDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 702Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB1148Face Recognition ActDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1150 / CH0757Vehicle Laws - Off-Highway Recreational VehiclesDelegate McMillanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 757Environment and Transportation
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1296Vehicle Laws - Class G (Trailer) Vehicles - Permanent RegistrationDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1401Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plate - United States Armed ForcesDelegate Wilson, C.In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1447 / CH0758Motor Vehicle Administration - Registration Plates - ReturnDelegate McMillanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 758Environment and Transportation
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1520
    (SB1056)
Vehicle Laws - Personal Motor Vehicle RentalsDelegate FlanaganIn the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB1645Task Force to Study Mental Health Concerns for Deaf and Hard of Hearing IndividualsDelegate AngelIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsDisabled (O3)
SB0009Motor Vehicles - Autonomous and Connected VehiclesChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/17/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0020Wicomico County - Vehicle Dealer's Licenses - Motor Home and Travel Trailer ShowsSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/17/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0034 / CH0344Motor Vehicles - Leased Vehicles - Inspections, Insurance, and Excise TaxChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 344Budget and Taxation
1/18/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0057 / CH0502
    (HB0648)
Income Tax Credit - Class F Vehicles - Modification and ExtensionSenator DeGrangeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 502Budget and Taxation
1/18/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0089Vehicle Laws - Drivers' Licenses and Vehicle Registrations - Mailing AddressSenator CassillyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
1/17/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0165 / CH0055Code Revision - Maryland Vehicle Law - PenaltiesPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 55Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0277Motor Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Prohibition on Suspension or Revocation of RegistrationSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
SB0902
    (HB1013)
Vehicle Laws - Safe Autonomous Vehicle (SAVE) ActSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0906 / CH0204
    (HB1047)
Child Support -Noncompliance With Court Order - License SuspensionSenator MuseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 204Judicial Proceedings
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB1056
    (HB1520)
Vehicle Laws - Personal Motor Vehicle RentalsSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB1133
    (HB0532)
Election Law - Qualification of Voters - Proof of IdentitySenator OaksIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; WithdrawnRulesElections (G1)
SB1163
    (HB0244)
Motor Vehicles - Duplicate Drivers' Licenses - Victims of RobberySenator PetersIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:53 A.M.