Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0885Vehicle Laws - Equipment - Prohibition on Counterfeit Airbags and Substandard AirbagsDelegate MitchellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB1110Consumer Protection - Sales of Tires - Limitations and Required NoticeDelegate KramerIn the House - Referred to interim study by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1139
    (SB0886)
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Relationship with DealersDelegate FrushIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEnvironmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB1179
    (SB0472)
Vehicle Laws - Motor Scooters and Mopeds - Special Dealer DecalsDelegate ConwayIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)Environmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0116Commercial Law - Cancellation of Sales of Motor Vehicles and Internet SalesSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0249Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Retaliation Against DealersSenator ForehandIn the Senate - Third Reading Failed (20-25)Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0472
    (HB1179)
Worcester County - Motor Scooters and Mopeds - Special Dealer DecalsSenator MathiasIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0886
    (HB1139)
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Relationship with DealersSenator StoneIn the Senate - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsJudicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.