Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0263 / CH0683School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Exclusion of Vehicle Rental Companies - Repeal and Notification RequirementDelegate CarrApproved by the Governor - Chapter 683Environment and Transportation
2/9/2017 - 1:15 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0756 / CH0747Vehicle Laws - Annual Vehicle ShowsDelegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 747Environment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1120 / CH0560
    (SB1004)
Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Performance StandardsDelegate Fraser-HidalgoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 560Environment and Transportation
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0020Wicomico County - Vehicle Dealer's Licenses - Motor Home and Travel Trailer ShowsSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/17/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0566Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and DealersSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB1004
    (HB1120 / CH0560)
Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Performance StandardsSenator HoughIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:17 P.M.