Motor Vehicle Equipment

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 21

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0032Drunk Driving - Transporting Minor - Ignition Interlock System ProgramDelegate AroraIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/23/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB0036Vehicle Laws - Seat Belts and Child Safety SeatsDelegate WilsonIn the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0122Commercial Law - Automotive Repair Facilities - Tire RepairsDelegate DavisIn the House - Referred to interim study by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0135Environment - Motor Vehicle Batteries - RecyclingDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0158
    (SB0192)
Vehicle Laws - Child Safety Seats and Seat Belts - PenaltyDelegate ReznikIn the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0693Vehicle Laws - Seat Belts and Child Safety SeatsDelegate ConwayIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0885Vehicle Laws - Equipment - Prohibition on Counterfeit Airbags and Substandard AirbagsDelegate MitchellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB1110Consumer Protection - Sales of Tires - Limitations and Required NoticeDelegate KramerIn the House - Referred to interim study by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1139
    (SB0886)
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Relationship with DealersDelegate FrushIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEnvironmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB1149Vehicle Laws - Stopping, Standing, and Parking - Plug-In VehiclesDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1235Vehicle Laws - Law Enforcement Vehicles - Tinted WindowsDelegate McDermottIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB1375Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor VehiclesDelegate FisherIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersEconomic MattersInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1392
    (SB0943)
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Decentralization - StudyDelegate O'DonnellIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB1415Vehicle Laws - Former School Vehicles - Rules of the Road and EquipmentDelegate MyersIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
SB0075 / CH0019Motor Vehicle Administration - Investigative Division - Issuance of CitationsChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 19Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0087 / CH0179Vehicle Laws - Seat Belts and Child Safety SeatsChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 179Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0116Commercial Law - Cancellation of Sales of Motor Vehicles and Internet SalesSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0192
    (HB0158)
Vehicle Laws - Child Safety Seats and Seat Belts - PenaltySenator KingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0499Vehicle Laws - Obstruction of Driver's ViewSenator MannoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0886
    (HB1139)
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Relationship with DealersSenator StoneIn the Senate - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsJudicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0943
    (HB1392)
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Decentralization - StudySenator ShankIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.