Motor Vehicle Inspection

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0316Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Exemptions - Vehicles With Low Annual MileageDelegate WivellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB1759Vehicle Laws - Personal Motor Vehicle RentalsDelegate FlanaganIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0044Vehicle Laws - School Buses - Inspection, Repair, and Maintenance RequirementsSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
SB0743 / CH0852
    (HB1045)
Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing ProgramsSenator MiddletonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 852Finance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:04 P.M.