Motor Vehicle Insurance

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 18

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0005 / CH0020
    (SB0403)
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist CoverageDelegate BarkleyEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 20Economic Matters
1/18/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Finance
2/21/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0603 / CH0345Vehicle Laws - Out-of-State Vehicles - Required SecurityDelegate ParrottApproved by the Governor - Chapter 345Environment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0916Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - ProhibitionsDelegate SydnorIn the House - Returned PassedEconomic Matters
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1013
    (SB0902)
Vehicle Laws - Safe Autonomous Vehicle (SAVE) ActDelegate McCrayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1224Environment - Liquid Waste Hauler - Vehicle License and InspectionDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1295
    (SB0533)
Low-Cost Automobile Insurance ProgramDelegate BrooksIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1385
    (SB0961)
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - SecurityDelegate ValderramaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB1520
    (SB1056)
Vehicle Laws - Personal Motor Vehicle RentalsDelegate FlanaganIn the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0034 / CH0344Motor Vehicles - Leased Vehicles - Inspections, Insurance, and Excise TaxChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 344Budget and Taxation
1/18/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0289Maryland Insurance Administration - Rate Making for Automobile and Homeowner's InsuranceSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Returned PassedFinance
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0290Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance Policies - Placement and ReinstatementSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Returned PassedFinance
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0403
    (HB0005 / CH0020)
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist CoverageSenator AstleIn the Senate - Returned PassedFinance
2/21/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic MattersInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0533
    (HB1295)
Low-Cost Automobile Insurance ProgramSenator BensonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0534Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - ProhibitionsSenator BensonIn the Senate - Returned PassedFinance
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0902
    (HB1013)
Vehicle Laws - Safe Autonomous Vehicle (SAVE) ActSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0961
    (HB1385)
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - SecuritySenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB1007Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor VehiclesSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB1056
    (HB1520)
Vehicle Laws - Personal Motor Vehicle RentalsSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 18, 2017 12:13 P.M.