Motor Vehicle Registration

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 27

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0061
    (SB0632 / CH0511)
State Brain Injury Trust FundDelegate McConkeyIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
1/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesPublic Health (J1)
HB0102 / CH0425
    (SB0127)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 425Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0176Transportation Trust Fund Protection ActDelegate KrebsIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0420 / CH0113Vehicle Laws - Maryland Transportation Authority - Payment of TollsChair, Environmental Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 113Environmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0429
    (SB0319)
Frederick County - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for All-Terrain and Utility-Terrain VehiclesFrederick County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0523 / CH0484
    (SB0486 / CH0483)
Short-Term Rental of Motorcycles - Sales and Use Tax and Motor Vehicle LawDelegate MyersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 484Environmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0524
    (SB0643)
Transportation Trust Fund - Use of FundsSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesAppropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
RulesTransportation - Generally (R2)
HB0680 / CH0632
    (SB0566)
Vehicle Laws - Unregistered Emergency Vehicles - Operating on HighwaysDelegate HoganApproved by the Governor - Chapter 632Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0723 / CH0274
    (SB0460 / CH0273)
Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Authority to PracticeDelegate TarrantApproved by the Governor - Chapter 274Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0725
    (SB0025 / CH0167)
Vehicle Laws - Title and Registration - Transfer to Surviving SpouseDelegate McMillanVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1046Transportation Trust Fund - Dedicated Highway FundsDelegate KrebsIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB1089
    (SB0919)
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Required SecurityDelegate BraveboyIn the Senate - Referred to interim study by FinanceEconomic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB1229Motor Vehicle Registration Fees - Exemptions - Surviving Spouses of VeteransDelegate WeirIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1255Motor Vehicles - Towing Services - LicensingDelegate NiemannIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1515 / CH0429
    (SB1054)
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 429Ways and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0025 / CH0167
    (HB0725)
Vehicle Laws - Title and Registration - Transfer to Surviving SpouseSenator ForehandApproved by the Governor - Chapter 167Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0076Motor Vehicle Administration - Fee-Setting Authority - Miscellaneous FeesChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and TaxationVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0253Transportation Trust Fund - Dedicated Highway FundsSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0293Vehicle Laws - Judgment Debtors - License and Registration Suspension - ModificationSenator ZirkinIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0319
    (HB0429)
Frederick County - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for All-Terrain and Utility-Terrain VehiclesSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0460 / CH0273
    (HB0723 / CH0274)
Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Authority to PracticeSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 273Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0486 / CH0483
    (HB0523 / CH0484)
Short-Term Rental of Motorcycles - Sales and Use Tax and Motor Vehicle LawSenator BrinkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 483Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0566
    (HB0680 / CH0632)
Vehicle Laws - Unregistered Emergency Vehicles - Operating on HighwaysSenator BrinkleyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0632 / CH0511
    (HB0061)
State Brain Injury Trust FundSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 511Finance
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0643
    (HB0524)
End the GridlockSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0829 / CH0422Transportation Trust Fund - Use of FundsSenator MillerAssigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 422Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Ways and Means
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB1054
    (HB1515 / CH0429)
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013PresidentIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesTaxes - Transportation (Q5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.