Motor Vehicle Registration

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 27

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0023
    (SB0341 / CH0696)
Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - DefinitionDelegate LamVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
1/26/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0066 / CH0385Environment - Lead and Mercury Wheel Weights - ProhibitedDelegate LamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 385Environment and Transportation
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0122 / CH0670Motor Vehicles - Electronic Inspection Certificates for Used Vehicles - Sunset ExtensionChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 670Environment and Transportation
2/9/2017 - 1:15 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0176 / CH0710
    (SB0299)
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Golden Beach Patuxent KnollsDelegate MorganApproved by the Governor - Chapter 710Environment and Transportation
2/9/2017 - 1:15 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0341Maryland Student Transportation Safety ActDelegate MieleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0343Motor Vehicles - Special Deafness Registration PlateDelegate AngelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0492 / CH0684Vehicle Laws - Certificate of Title - Transfer-on-Death Beneficiary DesignationDelegate CarrApproved by the Governor - Chapter 684Environment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0603 / CH0345Vehicle Laws - Out-of-State Vehicles - Required SecurityDelegate ParrottApproved by the Governor - Chapter 345Environment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0756 / CH0747Vehicle Laws - Annual Vehicle ShowsDelegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 747Environment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0783Vehicle Equipment - Driver Alcohol Detection System for Safety ProgramDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0889 / CH0748Vehicle Laws - HOV Lanes - Tow TrucksDelegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 748Environment and Transportation
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1013
    (SB0902)
Vehicle Laws - Safe Autonomous Vehicle (SAVE) ActDelegate McCrayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1296Vehicle Laws - Class G (Trailer) Vehicles - Permanent RegistrationDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1385
    (SB0961)
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - SecurityDelegate ValderramaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB1520
    (SB1056)
Vehicle Laws - Personal Motor Vehicle RentalsDelegate FlanaganIn the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0009Motor Vehicles - Autonomous and Connected VehiclesChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/17/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0034 / CH0344Motor Vehicles - Leased Vehicles - Inspections, Insurance, and Excise TaxChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 344Budget and Taxation
1/18/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0089Vehicle Laws - Drivers' Licenses and Vehicle Registrations - Mailing AddressSenator CassillyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
1/17/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0165 / CH0055Code Revision - Maryland Vehicle Law - PenaltiesPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 55Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0277Motor Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Prohibition on Suspension or Revocation of RegistrationSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
SB0299
    (HB0176 / CH0710)
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Golden Beach Patuxent KnollsSenator WaughVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0341 / CH0696
    (HB0023)
Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - DefinitionSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 696Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0902
    (HB1013)
Vehicle Laws - Safe Autonomous Vehicle (SAVE) ActSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0961
    (HB1385)
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - SecuritySenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0979 / CH0694Vehicle Laws - All-Terrain Vehicles and SnowmobilesSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 694Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB1056
    (HB1520)
Vehicle Laws - Personal Motor Vehicle RentalsSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB1097Vehicle Registration - Exception for Municipal RTV Utility Vehicles - Town of SykesvilleSenator BatesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:52 A.M.