Murder

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0295
    (SB0276 / CH0156)
Death Penalty Repeal and Appropriation from Savings to Aid Survivors of Homicide VictimsSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/14/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0477Firearms - Conviction for Crime of Violence - Probation Before JudgmentDelegate SimmonsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2013 - 12:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0478
    (SB0861)
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - PenaltiesDelegate SimmonsIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0699
    (SB0416)
Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of LimitationsDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0709 / CH0635
    (SB0444)
Criminal Law - Accessory After the Fact - Murder (The Sheddy-Bennett Act)Delegate McDermottApproved by the Governor - Chapter 635Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0909 / CH0650
    (SB0872)
Criminal Procedure - Venue for Prosecution of Murder and ManslaughterDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 650Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1043Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Multiple MurdersDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/14/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1211 / CH0486
    (SB0489 / CH0485)
Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law)Delegate SchulzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 486Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB1354Real Property - Disclosure Requirements - Death by Other Than Natural CausesDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0276 / CH0156
    (HB0295)
Death Penalty Repeal - Substitution of Life Without the Possibility of ParolePresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 156Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/8/2013 - 12:30 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0416
    (HB0699)
Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of LimitationsSenator ForehandIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0444
    (HB0709 / CH0635)
Criminal Law - Accessory After the Fact - Murder (The Sheddy-Bennett Act)Senator StoneIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0480Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder on School or Child Care Facility PropertySenator GettyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0489 / CH0485
    (HB1211 / CH0486)
Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law)Senator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 485Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0861
    (HB0478)
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - PenaltiesSenator ZirkinIn the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0872
    (HB0909 / CH0650)
Criminal Procedure - Venue for Prosecution of Murder and ManslaughterSenator JacobsIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.