Museums

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 18

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0094Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2006 - Anne Arundel County - Chesapeake Children's MuseumDelegate BuschIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
HB0358
    (SB0257)
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 - Montgomery County - Sandy Spring MuseumDelegate ZuckerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
HB0580
    (SB0352)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - National Electronics MuseumDelegate BeidleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0973
    (SB0723)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Kids International Discovery MuseumDelegate GutierrezIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1039
    (SB0883)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - The Baltimore Museum of Industry Capital ImprovementsDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1148 / CH0297
    (SB0592 / CH0296)
Natural Resources - Shark Fins - Restriction on Possession or DistributionDelegate LuedtkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 297Environmental Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1372 / CH0430
    (SB0934)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 430Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrior Authorizations (B4)
HB1473Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Arthur & Mary E. Ridgley, Sr. Museum Phase IDelegate GriffithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
HB1516Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2003 - Baltimore City - Carroll Mansion MuseumDelegate McHaleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
HB1521Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2005 - Baltimore City - Babe Ruth Birthplace and MuseumDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
SB0046Natural Resources - Shark or Elasmobranch Fins - Restriction on Possession, Distribution, or ConsumptionSenator ColburnIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0257
    (HB0358)
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 - Montgomery County - Sandy Spring MuseumSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
SB0352
    (HB0580)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - National Electronics MuseumSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0592 / CH0296
    (HB1148 / CH0297)
Natural Resources - Shark Fins - Restriction on Possession or DistributionSenator FroshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 296Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental MattersHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0723
    (HB0973)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Kids International Discovery MuseumSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0883
    (HB1039)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - The Baltimore Museum of Industry Capital ImprovementsSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0934
    (HB1372 / CH0430)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
SB1050Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - College Park Aviation MuseumSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.