Names

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 19

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0174 / CH0217
    (SB0114)
Public Safety - Internal Investigative Unit - Name Change and DutiesChair, Judiciary CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 217Judiciary
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Public Safety (E4)
HB0297
    (SB0332 / CH0002)
Prekindergarten Expansion Act of 2014SpeakerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0488
    (SB0084 / CH0016)
Joint Committee on Access to Mental Health Services - Name ChangeDelegate Pena-MelnykVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0692 / CH0609Maryland Perfusion Act - RevisionsDelegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 609Health and Government Operations
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0913Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity and Enforcement Act)Delegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1119
    (SB0877)
Board of Electricians - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians - Phase Out of Apprentice, Journeyperson, and Master Level Local LicensesDelegate Haddaway-RiccioIn the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEconomic Matters
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1215 / CH0340
    (SB0785 / CH0339)
Higher Education - 2+2 Transfer ScholarshipDelegate BohananApproved by the Governor - Chapter 340Ways and Means
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Higher Education (F2)
HB1393 / CH0455St. Mary's County - John Hanson Briscoe Circuit Courthouse for St. Mary's CountySt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 455Environmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1476 / CH0458Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2008 - Baltimore County - The Emmart-Pierpoint Safe HouseDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 458Appropriations
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
HJ0005Changing the Name of the Washington, D.C., Professional Football TeamDelegate WilsonIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
SB0020Office of the Deaf and Hard of Hearing - Name ChangeSenator ForehandIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnFinance
1/15/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0084 / CH0016
    (HB0488)
Joint Committee on Access to Mental Health Services - Name ChangeSenator BensonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 16Finance
1/15/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0103 / CH0030Public Health Programs for Children - Renaming and ModernizationChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 30Finance
1/15/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0114
    (HB0174 / CH0217)
Public Safety - Internal Investigative Unit - Name Change and DutiesChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
1/15/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0332 / CH0002
    (HB0297)
Prekindergarten Expansion Act of 2014PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 2Budget and Taxation
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0785 / CH0339
    (HB1215 / CH0340)
Higher Education - 2+2 Transfer ScholarshipSenator CurrieApproved by the Governor - Chapter 339Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0838Private Process Servers - LicensingSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0869Public Institutions of Higher Education - Restrictions on Altering Building NamesSenator BensonIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledBudget and Taxation Higher Education (F2)
SB0877
    (HB1119)
Board of Electricians - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians - Phase Out of Local LicensesSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.