Names

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 32

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0059
    (SB0085 / CH0338)
Department of Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - Renaming and ReorganizationChair, Economic Matters CommitteeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0199Orphans' Court - Change of Name to Probate CourtDelegate BromwellIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB0290 / CH0404
    (SB0545 / CH0403)
Labor and Employment - Apprenticeship Career Training in Our Neighborhoods (ACTION) Program - EstablishmentDelegate McCrayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 404Economic Matters
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0501 / CH0488Motor Vehicle Insurance - Volunteer DriversDelegate ChangApproved by the Governor - Chapter 488Economic Matters
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0699
    (SB0700)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 LaboratoriesDelegate Young, K.In the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesPublic Health (J1)
HB0823
    (SB0598)
General Provisions - Open Meetings Act - Annual Reporting Requirement, Web Site Postings, and TrainingDelegate MoralesIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0867
    (SB0517 / CH0217)
Washington County - Contributions to Nonprofit Organizations - ProcessWashington County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1172
    (SB0751)
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist CoverageDelegate ValderramaIn the House - Third Reading Passed (98-41)Economic Matters
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB1183Family Law - Divorce - Restoration of Former NameDelegate AngelIn the Senate - Favorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1280
    (SB0599)
AELR Committee - Renaming and Regulatory Adoption ProceduresDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB1411 / CH0711
    (SB1094 / CH0710)
Health - Recovery Residences - CertificationDelegate McMillanEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 711Health and Government Operations
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/6/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1420 / CH0739State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners - Licensure, Registration, and RegulationDelegate CullisonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 739Health and Government Operations
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1446 / CH0653State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Recordation of Governing and Charter Documents - ProhibitionsDelegate McComasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 653Economic Matters
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
HB1584Open Meetings Act - Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland - Closed SessionsDelegate BromwellIn the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB1607
    (SB1052 / CH0025)
University of Maryland Strategic Partnership Act of 2016Delegate AndersonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsHigher Education (F2)
HB1624 / CH0526
    (SB1104 / CH0525)
Transportation - Highways - Heroes HighwayDelegate ReillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 526Environment and Transportation
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
FinanceTransportation - Highways (R1)
SB0066 / CH0335Professional Corporations - Approval of Corporate Name by Licensing Unit and Professional Organization - ExemptionSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 335Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
SB0085 / CH0338
    (HB0059)
Department of Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - Renaming and ReorganizationChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 338Finance
1/21/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0092 / CH0343Planned Apprenticeship Standards and On-the-Job Training Activities - RevisionsChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 343Finance
1/21/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0094 / CH0344Workforce Development - RevisionsChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 344Finance
1/21/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0282 / CH0185Early Childhood Development - Transfer of ProvisionsChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 185Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0517 / CH0217
    (HB0867)
Washington County - Contributions to Nonprofit Organizations - ProcessWashington County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 217Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0545 / CH0403
    (HB0290 / CH0404)
Labor and Employment - Apprenticeship Career Training in Our Neighborhoods (ACTION) Program - EstablishmentSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 403Finance
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0599
    (HB1280)
AELR Committee - Renaming and Regulatory Adoption ProceduresSenator MannoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0616State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Naming Rights for Rest Areas and Welcome CentersSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB0617Transportation - State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Highway Naming RightsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB0724 / CH0041Alcoholic Beverages ArticlePresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 41Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0725 / CH0228Alcoholic Beverages - Cross-References and CorrectionsPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 228Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0882 / CH0444
    (HB1589)
Economic Development - Northeastern Maryland Additive Manufacturing Innovation AuthoritySenator JenningsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 444Finance
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB1052 / CH0025
    (HB1607)
University of Maryland Strategic Partnership Act of 2016Senator FergusonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 25Budget and Taxation
3/1/2016 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB1094 / CH0710
    (HB1411 / CH0711)
Health - Recovery Residences - CertificationSenator AstleEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 710Finance
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB1104 / CH0525
    (HB1624 / CH0526)
Transportation - Highways - Heroes HighwayHarford County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 525Finance
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.