Natural Resources

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0002
    (SB0615)
Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation EasementsDelegate SteinIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0449 / CH0481
    (SB0409 / CH0480)
Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - RegulationsDelegate Fraser-HidalgoEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 481Environment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment (M3)
HB0713Natural Resources - Trade in Ivory and Rhinoceros Horn - ProhibitionDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/4/2015 - 1:15 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0914
    (SB0322)
Natural Resources - Nuisance Organisms - Reward for InformationDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1091
    (SB0134)
Open Space Incentive Program - Payments to CountiesDelegate BeitzelIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1281Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Maryland Search and Rescue Wilderness EMSDelegate Young, P.In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0029Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - ProhibitionsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0057
    (HB0072 / CH0489)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0322
    (HB0914)
Natural Resources - Nuisance Organisms - Reward for InformationSenator MiddletonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0409 / CH0480
    (HB0449 / CH0481)
Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - RegulationsSenator MontgomeryEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 480Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationEnvironment (M3)
SB0615
    (HB0002)
Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation EasementsSenator EckardtIn the House - Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0712Natural Gas Severance Tax and Impact AccountSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.