Negligence

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 20

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0023Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse RegistryDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
1/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0040
    (SB0386)
Courts - Certificate of Merit - Provider of Professional ServicesDelegate RosenbergIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0041Immunities - Associations, Organizations, and Charities - Liability of Agents and VolunteersDelegate RosenbergIn the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0395Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - PenaltiesDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/4/2015 - 1:15 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0398Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic InjuryDelegate CarterIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0455
    (SB0387)
Agreements to Defend or Pay the Cost of Defense - VoidDelegate ParrottIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0492Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection ActDelegate AfzaliIn the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/16/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0659Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction ActDelegate AndersonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1040
    (SB0730)
Wicomico County - Board of EducationWicomico County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB1059
    (SB0686)
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction ActDelegate Barnes, D.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0018State Board of Dental Examiners - Dentists and Dental Hygienists - Grounds for DisciplineSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0026Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Leaving Dogs Outside in Extreme TemperaturesSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/4/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0232Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - PenaltiesSenator CassillyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0386
    (HB0040)
Courts - Certificate of Merit - Provider of Professional ServicesSenator HoughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0387
    (HB0455)
Agreements to Defend or Pay the Cost of Defense - VoidSenator HoughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0458Civil Actions - Hydraulic Fracturing Liability ActSenator ZirkinIn the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0479Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic InjurySenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0517Criminal Law - Use and Possession of Marijuana and Drug ParaphernaliaSenator ZirkinVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Judicial Proceedings
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0686
    (HB1059)
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction ActSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0730
    (HB1040)
Wicomico County - Board of EducationSenator EckardtIn the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.