Negligence

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0157 / CH0518Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - PenaltiesDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 518Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0265Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Health Care Facilities - Abuser RegistryDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/4/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB0279Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Abuser Registry Workgroup Recommendations - ReportDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/4/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0399 / CH0451
    (SB0926 / CH0450)
Lyme Disease - Laboratory Test - Required NoticeDelegate AfzaliApproved by the Governor - Chapter 451Health and Government Operations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0441Public Health - Assisted Outpatient Treatment and Mobile Crisis TeamsDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsPublic Health (J1)
HB0629Criminal Law - Law Enforcement Officers - MisconductDelegate MoonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0644
    (SB0691)
Public Health - Provision of Life-Preserving Health Care Services (Vulnerable Protection Act)Delegate AumannIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0869
    (SB0574)
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic InjuryDelegate CarterIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0871 / CH0636
    (SB0234)
Agreements to Defend or Pay the Cost of Defense - VoidDelegate ParrottApproved by the Governor - Chapter 636Judiciary
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0885Behavioral Health Administration - Creation and Maintenance of Mental Health Professional Profiles (Patient Protection Provider Information Act)Delegate VogtIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0974Serious and Subsequent Offenders - Conditions for Reinstatement of Driver's LicenseDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB1154
    (SB0951)
Maryland Lead Poisoning Recovery ActDelegate CarterIn the House - Hearing cancelled (Judiciary)Environment and Transportation
Judiciary
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1169
    (SB0963)
Harris Creek Oyster Restoration - Vessel Damage - CompensationDelegate MautzIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB1196Civil Action - Wrongfully Selling or Furnishing Alcoholic BeveragesDelegate AngelIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1414Reckless and Negligent Driving - Death of Another - Must-Appear Violation (Ryan's Law)Delegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0160 / CH0517Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - PenaltiesSenator CassillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 517Judicial Proceedings
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0234
    (HB0871 / CH0636)
Agreements to Defend or Pay the Cost of Defense - VoidSenator HoughVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0361Civil Actions - Hydraulic Fracturing Liability ActSenator RaskinIn the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0574
    (HB0869)
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic InjurySenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0691
    (HB0644)
Public Health - Provision of Life-Preserving Health Care Services (Vulnerable Protection Act)Senator BatesIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0926 / CH0450
    (HB0399 / CH0451)
Lyme Disease - Laboratory Test - Required NoticeSenator YoungApproved by the Governor - Chapter 450Finance
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0951
    (HB1154)
Maryland Lead Poisoning Recovery ActSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0963
    (HB1169)
Harris Creek Oyster Restoration - Vessel Damage - CompensationSenator EckardtIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.