News Media

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0749
    (SB0551)
Vehicle Laws – Dedicated Bus Lanes – EnforcementDelegate Lewis, R.In the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0815 / CH0744Calvert County - Procurement - Contracts and BiddingCalvert County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 744Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0892Marijuana Laws – Full Disclosure of Legal, Employment, and Health Risks – Advertisement of Marijuana and Medical CannabisDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1185
    (SB0399 / CH0635)
Baltimore City - Board of License Commissioners - License Application Newspaper NoticeBaltimore City DelegationIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEconomic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1385 / CH0641
    (SB1085 / CH0642)
Baltimore City - Tourism Improvement DistrictDelegate AndersonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 641Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1401 / CH0169Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2018Delegate BeitzelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 169Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1638
    (SB0788)
Public Information Act - RevisionsDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0399 / CH0635
    (HB1185)
Baltimore City - Board of License Commissioners - License Application Newspaper NoticeSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 635Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0551
    (HB0749)
Vehicle Laws - Bus Lane Monitoring Cameras - AuthorizationSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0788
    (HB1638)
Public Information Act - RevisionsSenator KaganIn the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0875 / CH0833
    (HB0981 / CH0834)
Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability ActSenator ZuckerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 833Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB1085 / CH0642
    (HB1385 / CH0641)
Baltimore City - Tourism Improvement DistrictSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 642Finance
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationCounties - Local Laws (L2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:02 P.M.