Noise

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 3

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0237
    (SB0331)
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - License RenewalDelegate OaksIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1514 / CH0421Howard County - Noise Control - Outdoor Concert Venues Ho. Co. 9-13Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 421Environmental Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0331
    (HB0237)
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - License RenewalSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.