Notaries Public

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0899
    (SB0114)
Harford County - Board of License Commissioners - Temporary License ApplicationHarford County DelegationIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEconomic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0985
    (SB0280)
Task Force to Study Notary Laws and Remote and Electronic NotarizationDelegate PlattIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1335Public Health - Abortions Sought by Minors - Parent or Guardian ConsentDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/9/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1634 / CH0731
    (SB1068 / CH0732)
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018Delegate FrickApproved by the Governor - Chapter 731Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0114
    (HB0899)
Harford County - Board of License Commissioners - Temporary License ApplicationSenator NormanIn the House - First Reading Economic MattersEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0247State Government - Notaries Public - Travel FeesSenator NormanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0280
    (HB0985)
Task Force to Study Notary Laws and Remote and Electronic NotarizationSenator NormanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB1068 / CH0732
    (HB1634 / CH0731)
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018Senator RosapepeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 732Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:37 A.M.