Nuisances

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0870 / CH0585
    (SB0876 / CH0584)
Natural Resources - Black Fly Management and Control - Washington CountyDelegate ParrottApproved by the Governor - Chapter 585Environment and Transportation
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0149Juvenile Law - Citations for ViolationsSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
1/28/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0328
    (HB0220)
Criminal Procedure - ExpungementSenator ConwayIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0876 / CH0584
    (HB0870 / CH0585)
Natural Resources - Black Fly Management and Control - Washington CountySenator SerafiniApproved by the Governor - Chapter 584Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.