Nurses

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0179 / CH0256
    (SB0401 / CH0255)
Pharmacists - Administration of Vaccinations - Expanded Authority and Reporting RequirementsDelegate HubbardApproved by the Governor - Chapter 256Health and Government Operations
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0302Maryland Medical Marijuana ActDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/8/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/8/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0530
    (SB0359)
Education - School Vehicles - Authorized RidersDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsEnvironmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0624 / CH0282
    (SB0501 / CH0281)
State Board of Nursing - Licensure by Endorsement - Clinical ExperienceDelegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 282Health and Government Operations
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0630Rules of Interpretation - Interpretation of "Physician" - Inclusion of Advanced Practice Nurse and Physician AssistantDelegate Nathan-PulliamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0810Mental Health Professionals - Duty to Report Risk of Serious Harm - Firearm SafetyDelegate SimmonsIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/1/2013 - 12:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0890
    (SB0610 / CH0299)
Health - Overdose Response Program - EstablishmentDelegate BromwellVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Public Health (J1)
HB1014 / CH0560
    (SB0815 / CH0559)
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Epinephrine Availability and Use - PolicyDelegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 560Ways and Means
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1117Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Mandatory Coverage - Medical and Hospital BenefitsDelegate DonoghueIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1151
    (SB0760)
State Board of Nursing - Certified Nurse-Midwives - Standards and Practice GuidelinesDelegate Kelly, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1293
    (SB0647)
Higher Education and Health Occupations - Nurse Midwifery Program - StudyDelegate Kelly, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriationsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1310
    (SB0834)
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"Delegate DumaisIn the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1529
    (SB1057 / CH0340)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Health Care Staff Agencies - RegulationDelegate HammenIn the Senate - Rereferred to FinanceHealth and Government Operations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
FinanceHealth Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0382Mental Health - Emergency Evaluations - Surrender of FirearmsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsPublic Health (J1)
SB0401 / CH0255
    (HB0179 / CH0256)
Pharmacists - Administration of Vaccinations - Expanded Authority and Reporting RequirementsSenator DysonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 255Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0501 / CH0281
    (HB0624 / CH0282)
State Board of Nursing - Licensure by Endorsement - Clinical ExperienceSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 281Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0610 / CH0299
    (HB0890)
Health - Overdose Response Program - EstablishmentSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 299Finance
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0647
    (HB1293)
Higher Education and Health Occupations - Nurse Midwifery Program - StudySenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0693Health - Certified Nurse-Midwives and Freestanding Birthing Centers - Certificate of Need and Practice PrivilegesSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0747Rules of Interpretation - Interpretation of "Physician" - Inclusion of Advanced Practice Nurse and Physician AssistantSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0760
    (HB1151)
State Board of Nursing - Certified Nurse-Midwives - Standards and Practice GuidelinesSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0815 / CH0559
    (HB1014 / CH0560)
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Epinephrine Availability and Use - PolicySenator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 559Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB1057 / CH0340
    (HB1529)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Health Care Staff Agencies - RegulationSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 340Finance
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.