Nurses

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 18

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0027 / CH0212
    (SB0656)
Correctional Services - Healthy Births for Incarcerated Women ActDelegate Washington, M.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212Judiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Public Safety (E4)
HB0395
    (SB0702)
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"Delegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0441
    (SB0980)
Anesthesia Services - Assignment of Billing Rights and Fees for Management Services - ProhibitionDelegate Haddaway-RiccioIn the House - Hearing cancelledHealth and Government Operations Health Occupations (J2)
HB0641 / CH0196
    (SB0803 / CH0195)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Communications Between Patient or Client and Health Care Professional - Exceptions to PrivilegeDelegate SimmonsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 196Judiciary
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0661 / CH0608Health - Statistics and Records - Electronic Filing of Death CertificatesDelegate MyersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 608Health and Government Operations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0908 / CH0560
    (SB0849 / CH0559)
State Board of Nursing - Nurses, Nursing Assistants, Medication Technicians, and Electrologists - Licensing, Certification, Regulation, Violations, and PenaltiesDelegate Nathan-PulliamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 560Health and Government Operations
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Health Occupations (J2)
HB0963 / CH0627Hospitals - Protocol for Sexual Assault Medical Forensic Examinations and Planning CommitteeDelegate KellyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 627Health and Government Operations
2/28/2014 - 12:30 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB1211State Board of Nursing - Midwives - Licensing and RegulationDelegate KellyIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1339
    (SB0807)
Drivers' Licenses - Disorder, Disease, or Physical Disability - Defining and ReportingDelegate SteinIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1404Health Care Disparities, Cultural and Linguistic Competency, and Health Literacy - Continuing EducationDelegate Nathan-PulliamIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Health Occupations (J2)
HB1456 / CH0457Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - JurisdictionChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 457Health and Government Operations
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0105 / CH0031Health - Vital Records - Birth Certificates - Preparation and Filing RequirementsChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 31Finance
1/9/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0656
    (HB0027 / CH0212)
Correctional Services - Healthy Births for Incarcerated Women ActSenator RaskinIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations Public Safety (E4)
SB0702
    (HB0395)
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"Senator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0803 / CH0195
    (HB0641 / CH0196)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Communications Between Patient or Client and Health Care Professional - Exceptions to PrivilegeSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 195Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0807
    (HB1339)
Drivers' Licenses - Disorder, Disease, or Physical Disability - Identification, Disclosure, and ReportingSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0849 / CH0559
    (HB0908 / CH0560)
State Board of Nursing - Nurses, Nursing Assistants, Medication Technicians, and Electrologists - Licensing, Certification, Regulation, Violations, and PenaltiesSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 559Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0980
    (HB0441)
Anesthesia Services - Assignment of Billing Rights and Fees for Management Services - ProhibitionSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs Health Occupations (J2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.