Nurses

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 20

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0015Harford County - Suspected Overdoses - Reporting RequirementDelegate SzeligaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0104 / CH0474Medical Cannabis - Written Certifications - Certifying ProvidersDelegate MorhaimApproved by the Governor - Chapter 474Health and Government Operations
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Public Health (J1)
HB0107 / CH0251Higher Education - Walter Sondheim Jr. Public Service Internship Scholarship Program - Scholarship AmountDelegate RosenbergApproved by the Governor - Chapter 251Ways and Means
2/4/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0490 / CH0200
    (SB0393 / CH0199)
Maryland Nurse Practice Act - Peer Review and Advisory Committees and PenaltiesDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 200Health and Government Operations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0752 / CH0116
    (SB0647)
Physicians - Prescriptions Written by Physician Assistants or Nurse Practitioners - Preparing and DispensingDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 116Health and Government Operations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0771 / CH0277
    (SB0071)
Public Schools - Administration of Diabetes Care Services - GuidelinesDelegate Barnes, D.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277Ways and Means
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0911Family Law - Marriage - Age RequirementsDelegate AtterbearyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0944Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Misconduct (Lynette's Law)Delegate VogtIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1103Health Care Practitioners - Use of TeletherapyDelegate ReznikIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1235
    (SB0895)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Nursing Services - Skills ChecklistDelegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1492
    (SB0928)
Task Force to Study the Nurse Shortage in MarylandDelegate KaiserIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1561
    (SB1081 / CH0241)
Mental Health - Voluntary and Involuntary Admissions - Certification by Psychiatric Nurse PractitionersDelegate Sample-HughesIn the House - Third Reading Passed (140-1)Health and Government Operations
4/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0071
    (HB0771 / CH0277)
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Student Diabetes Management ProgramSenator YoungIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0108 / CH0159Nurse Support Program Assistance Fund - RevisionsChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 159Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0393 / CH0199
    (HB0490 / CH0200)
Maryland Nurse Practice Act - Peer Review and Advisory Committees and PenaltiesSenator Nathan-PulliamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 199Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0411 / CH0385
    (HB1494 / CH0386)
Income Tax - Credit for Preceptors in Areas With Health Care Workforce ShortagesSenator EckardtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 385Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0647
    (HB0752 / CH0116)
Physicians - Prescriptions Written by Physician Assistants or Nurse Practitioners - Preparing and DispensingSenator KlausmeierVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0895
    (HB1235)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Nursing Services - Skills ChecklistSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0928
    (HB1492)
Task Force to Study the Nurse Shortage in MarylandSenator MiddletonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsHealth Occupations (J2)
SB1081 / CH0241
    (HB1561)
Mental Health - Voluntary and Involuntary Admissions - Certification by Psychiatric Nurse PractitionersSenator EckardtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 241Finance
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.