Nurses

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0070
    (SB0151)
State Board of Nursing - Disciplinary Process and Authority - RevisionsDelegate CullisonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0253 / CH0623State Board of Nursing - Registered Nurses and Licensed Practical Nurses - Renewal of Licenses - Continuing Education UnitsDelegate AngelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 623Health and Government Operations
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0482 / CH0515
    (SB0385 / CH0516)
Maryland Nurse Practice Act - RevisionsDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 515Health and Government Operations
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0613 / CH0820
    (SB0363 / CH0821)
Pharmacists - Contraceptives - Prescribing and DispensingDelegate HettlemanEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 820Health and Government Operations
2/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0661Public Health - Suspected Overdoses - Reporting RequirementDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0683 / CH0235
    (SB0436 / CH0234)
Income Tax - Credit for Nurse Practitioner or Licensed Physician in Preceptorship Program - AlterationsDelegate Sample-HughesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 235Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0791
    (SB0868)
Overdose Response Program - Prescribing and Dispensing of Naloxone - Noncertificate HoldersDelegate BarronIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1082 / CH0573
    (SB1060 / CH0574)
Heroin and Opioid Education and Community Action Act of 2017 (Start Talking Maryland Act)Delegate BromwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 573Health and Government Operations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1113
    (SB0988)
Health Occupations - Maryland Community Health Worker ActDelegate LamIn the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)Health and Government Operations
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1233
    (SB0984)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Enhanced Security Compassionate Release ProgramDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1347
    (SB0877)
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury FundDelegate CullisonIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 2:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/6/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1432 / CH0570Health Care Providers - Prescription Opioids - Limits on Prescribing (The Prescriber Limits Act of 2017)Chair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 570Health and Government Operations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1632 / CH0011
    (SB1174)
Public Health - Certificates of Birth - Births Outside an InstitutionDelegate KipkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 11Health and Government Operations
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
FinancePublic Health (J1)
SB0038 / CH0040Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Updating Advisory Boards and CouncilsChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 40Finance
1/19/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0041 / CH0669State Board of Nursing - Nurse Licensure Compact - RevisionsChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 669Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0151
    (HB0070)
State Board of Nursing - Disciplinary Process and Authority - RevisionsSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0363 / CH0821
    (HB0613 / CH0820)
Pharmacists - Contraceptives - Prescribing and DispensingSenator ConwayEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 821Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0385 / CH0516
    (HB0482 / CH0515)
Maryland Nurse Practice Act - RevisionsSenator Nathan-PulliamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 516Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0436 / CH0234
    (HB0683 / CH0235)
Income Tax - Credit for Nurse Practitioner or Licensed Physician in Preceptorship Program - AlterationsSenator EckardtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 234Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0868
    (HB0791)
Overdose Response Program - Prescribing and Dispensing of Naloxone - Noncertificate HoldersSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0877
    (HB1347)
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury FundSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0984
    (HB1233)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Enhanced Security Compassionate Release ProgramSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Public Health (J1)
SB1060 / CH0574
    (HB1082 / CH0573)
Heroin and Opioid Education and Community Action Act of 2017 (Start Talking Maryland Act)Senator MillerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 574Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:58 A.M.