Nurses

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0490
    (SB0163 / CH0441)
Public Health - Community Health Workers - Advisory Committee and CertificationDelegate LamVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0569Vital Statistics and Records – Definition of Licensed Health Care Practitioner – Certified Nurse Midwife, Licensed Clinical Professional Counselor, and Physician AssistantDelegate MoralesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0622 / CH0386
    (SB0161 / CH0385)
Public Schools – Students With Sickle Cell Disease – GuidelinesDelegate PattersonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 386Ways and Means
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0863 / CH0483
    (SB0698)
State Board of Nursing - Advanced Practice Registered Nurses - Certification and PracticeDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 483Health and Government Operations
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0909
    (SB0862)
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury FundDelegate CullisonIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations and Judiciary)Health and Government Operations
3/9/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1289Correctional Services - Arrested Persons - Mental Disorder ScreeningsDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1299Nursing Facilities - Discharge Plans - Review and Signature RequirementDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsHealth Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB1302 / CH0250Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective OrdersDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 250Judiciary
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2018 - 11:30 a.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1437 / CH0528
    (SB1114 / CH0529)
Maryland Licensure of Direct-Entry Midwives Act - RevisionsDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 528Health and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1628Privileged Communications – Mental Health Providers – Exception for Suspected Child Abuse and NeglectDelegate HettlemanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryFamily Law (D4)
SB0008 / CH0656State Board of Nursing - Maryland Nurse Practice Act - RevisionsChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 656Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0161 / CH0385
    (HB0622 / CH0386)
Public Schools – Students With Sickle Cell Disease – GuidelinesSenator Nathan-PulliamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 385Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0163 / CH0441
    (HB0490)
Public Health – Community Health Workers – Advisory Committee and CertificationSenator Nathan-PulliamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 441Finance
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0476Dispensing of Naloxone - Hospital Emergency Departments - Registered NursesSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinancePublic Health (J1)
SB0698
    (HB0863 / CH0483)
State Board of Nursing - Advanced Practice Registered Nurses - Certification and PracticeSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0862
    (HB0909)
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury FundSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB1114 / CH0529
    (HB1437 / CH0528)
Maryland Licensure of Direct-Entry Midwives Act - RevisionsSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 529Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 29, 2018 3:56 P.M.