Nursing Homes

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 19

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0100 / CH0381Dental Hygienists - Practice in Long-Term Care Facilities - Repeal of Termination DateDelegate KipkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 381Health and Government Operations
1/23/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0271
    (SB0276)
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial StudiesDelegate BromwellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elderly (O2)
HB0298 / CH0263
    (SB0335)
Health Services Cost Review Commission - Powers and Duties, Regulation of Facilities, and Maryland All-Payer Model ContractSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 263Health and Government Operations
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB0379Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse RegistryDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0590 / CH0413Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Waivers - Consolidation and RepealChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 413Health and Government Operations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0710
    (SB0483 / CH0510)
Labor and Employment - Nursing Homes and Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety Assessment and Safety ProgramDelegate CullisonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0784
    (SB0732)
Income Tax Credit - Emergency Backup GeneratorsDelegate Miller, A.In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0846Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Viatical Settlement Contracts - Long-Term Care ServicesDelegate HixsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/28/2014 - 12:30 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1072Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities - Sex OffendersDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB1266
    (SB0890)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Minimum Wage ReimbursementDelegate GuzzoneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Public Health (J1)
HB1373Environment - Permits to Construct or Materially Alter an Incinerator - Limitations on IssuanceDelegate NiemannIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1456 / CH0457Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - JurisdictionChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 457Health and Government Operations
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1511Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Adult Dependent Care Providers - Maryland Background Check ProgramChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/14/2014 - 12:30 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0013Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program Advisory CommitteeChair, Finance CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
1/9/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
Elderly (O2)
SB0276
    (HB0271)
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial StudiesSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elderly (O2)
SB0335
    (HB0298 / CH0263)
Health Services Cost Review Commission - Powers and Duties, Regulation of Facilities, and Maryland All-Payer Model ContractPresidentIn the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0483 / CH0510
    (HB0710)
Labor and Employment - Nursing Homes and Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety Assessment and Safety ProgramSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 510Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0732
    (HB0784)
Income and Sales Tax Incentives - Emergency Preparedness EquipmentSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0890
    (HB1266)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Minimum Wage ReimbursementSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.