Nursing Homes

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 14

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0186 / CH0317Department of Veterans Affairs - Charlotte Hall Veterans Home Fund - EstablishmentChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 317Health and Government Operations
2/4/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0362Department of Veterans Affairs - Study of Solar Photovoltaic System - Charlotte Hall Veterans HomeDelegate HolmesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0404
    (SB0418)
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option ActDelegate PendergrassIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
2/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Public Health (J1)
HB0437 / CH0147
    (SB0537)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - ModificationsDelegate BarronApproved by the Governor - Chapter 147Health and Government Operations
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0588Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial StudiesDelegate BromwellIn the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elderly (O2)
HB0714Nursing Homes - Health Care Quality Account - Adoption and Use of Electronic Health RecordsDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsHealth Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB1181 / CH0303
    (SB0939)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Determinations of Eligibility for Long-Term Care Services - Reports and MeetingsDelegate MorganApproved by the Governor - Chapter 303Health and Government Operations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1385 / CH0510Public Health - Advance Directives - Procedures, Information Sheet, and Use of Electronic Advance DirectivesDelegate MorhaimApproved by the Governor - Chapter 510Health and Government Operations
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/6/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1542
    (SB1092)
Nursing Facilities - Quality Assessment - ModificationDelegate Barnes, B.In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsHealth Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0109 / CH0048Health Occupations Boards - Criminal History Records Checks - RequiredChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 48Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0418
    (HB0404)
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option ActSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0537
    (HB0437 / CH0147)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - ModificationsSenator KlausmeierVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0939
    (HB1181 / CH0303)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Determinations of Eligibility for Long-Term Care Services - Reports and MeetingsSenator MadalenoIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsPublic Health (J1)
SB1092
    (HB1542)
Nursing Facilities - Quality Assessment - ModificationSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.