Oaths

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 3

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB1169
    (SB0343)
Baltimore City - Office of State's Attorney - Authority to Appoint Criminal InvestigatorsDelegate AndersonIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0178
    (HB1020)
State Retirement and Pension System – Board of Trustees – OathSenator GuzzoneVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Budget and Taxation
1/25/2018 - 9:30 a.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0343
    (HB1169)
Baltimore City - Office of State's Attorney - Authority to Appoint Criminal InvestigatorsSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)

May 29, 2018 3:54 P.M.