Organ Donorship

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0096 / CH0036Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Living Organ DonorsDelegate BuschApproved by the Governor - Chapter 36Ways and Means
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0106 / CH0186
    (SB0475 / CH0187)
Emergency Vehicles - Organ Delivery VehiclesDelegate BuschApproved by the Governor - Chapter 186Environment and Transportation
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0123Emergency Vehicles - Blood, Organ, or Tissue Delivery VehiclesDelegate AngelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0442Education – Organ and Tissue Donation Awareness Instruction in Public and Nonpublic High SchoolsDelegate QueenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsWays and Means
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0691 / CH0444Organ and Tissue Donation Awareness Fund - Donor Registry - Annual FundingDelegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 444Health and Government Operations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0475 / CH0187
    (HB0106 / CH0186)
Emergency Vehicles - Organ Delivery VehiclesSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 187Judicial Proceedings
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 11, 2018 4:18 P.M.