Orphans' Court

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 15

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0008
    (SB0168 / CH0196)
Estates and Trusts - Guardianship Accounts - Form and LimitsDelegate VitaleVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
1/23/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB0163
    (SB0172)
Circuit Court for Anne Arundel County - Judges Sitting as Orphans' CourtAnne Arundel County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
1/30/2013 - 2:30 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0515
    (SB0327)
Elections for Judges - Nonpartisan ElectionsDelegate RosenbergIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsWays and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB0520St. Mary's County - Public Officials - SalariesSt. Mary's County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0720 / CH0558
    (SB0814 / CH0557)
Washington County - Salary Study Commission - Updating Salary and Expense ProvisionsWashington County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 558Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0910Anne Arundel County - Orphans' Court Judges - SalaryDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB1024Employees' Pension System - Elected or Appointed Officials - MembershipDelegate McDermottVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB1400Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - SalaryBaltimore County DelegationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB1407 / CH0153Howard County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary Ho. Co. 12-13Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 153Judiciary
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0168 / CH0196
    (HB0008)
Estates and Trusts - Guardianship Accounts - Form and LimitsSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 196Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0172
    (HB0163)
Circuit Court for Anne Arundel County - Judges Sitting as Orphans' CourtAnne Arundel County SenatorsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0327
    (HB0515)
Elections for Judges of the Orphans' Courts - Nonpartisan ElectionsSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Dyson)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0674 / CH0522Employees' Pension System - Elected or Appointed Officials - MembershipSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 522Budget and Taxation
2/21/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0814 / CH0557
    (HB0720 / CH0558)
Washington County - Salary Study Commission - Updating Salary and Expense ProvisionsSenator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 557Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0931 / CH0335Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - SalarySenator StoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 335Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.