Parking

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 19

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0320 / CH0033
    (SB0217 / CH0032)
Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates for Individuals with Disabilities - Parking in Baltimore CountyBaltimore County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 33Environmental Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0335 / CH0574
    (SB0900 / CH0573)
Baltimore City - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Economic Development ProjectsDelegate MitchellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 574Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0613 / CH0624Sustainable Communities - Designation and FinancingChair, Environmental Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 624Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0642 / CH0628Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Sewage Leaks - Posting Requirements MC/PG 114-13Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 628Environmental Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0723 / CH0274
    (SB0460 / CH0273)
Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Authority to PracticeDelegate TarrantApproved by the Governor - Chapter 274Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0770
    (SB0742 / CH0312)
Vehicle Laws - Residential Parking in Baltimore CityDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0781 / CH0388
    (SB0987)
Vehicle Laws - Towing or Removal of Vehicles - NoticeDelegate GilchristApproved by the Governor - Chapter 388Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB1065
    (SB1014)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Olde Mill Community and Teaching CenterDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1143Gaming - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Pimlico Historic Preservation CommissionDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansGaming (C7)
HB1149Vehicle Laws - Stopping, Standing, and Parking - Plug-In VehiclesDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1372 / CH0430
    (SB0934)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 430Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrior Authorizations (B4)
HB1500Vehicle Laws - Handicapped Parking Placards - Required StatementDelegate ConawayIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0217 / CH0032
    (HB0320 / CH0033)
Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates for Individuals with Disabilities - Parking in Baltimore CountySenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 32Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0460 / CH0273
    (HB0723 / CH0274)
Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Authority to PracticeSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 273Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0742 / CH0312
    (HB0770)
Vehicle Laws - Residential Parking in Baltimore CitySenator Jones-RodwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 312Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0900 / CH0573
    (HB0335 / CH0574)
Baltimore City - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Economic Development ProjectsSenator Jones-RodwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 573Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0934
    (HB1372 / CH0430)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
SB0987
    (HB0781 / CH0388)
Vehicle Laws - Towing or Removal of Vehicles - NoticeSenator ForehandIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB1014
    (HB1065)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Olde Mill Community and Teaching CenterSenator CurrieIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.