Parking

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0036
    (SB0302)
Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking SpacesDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
1/26/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0098
    (SB0069)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Loopers Field Improvement ProjectDelegate SimonaireIn the House - Hearing canceledAppropriationsState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0699
    (SB0301)
Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging EquipmentDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1043Vehicle Laws - Smoking Marijuana in Vehicles - ProhibitionDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1455Highway Parking - Prohibition Against Prolonged Parking of Inoperable or Disabled VehicleDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0136Vehicle Laws - Parking Violations - Authority of Political SubdivisionsSenator LeeIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Lee)Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0301
    (HB0699)
Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging EquipmentSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0302
    (HB0036)
Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking SpacesSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)

March 21, 2017 10:59 A.M.