Parking

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0137Transportation - Aviation - Nonairport Taxicab Operators at BWIDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Returned PassedEconomic Matters
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0372 / CH0352
    (SB0277 / CH0351)
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding ActDelegate KormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 352Appropriations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0492Vehicle Laws - Civil Violations - Administrative PenaltiesDelegate AliIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0575 / CH0345Condominiums - Suspension of Use of Common ElementsDelegate HolmesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 345Environment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0598Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking SpacesDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0602Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging EquipmentDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0889Motor Vehicles - Driver's License Examination - Parallel ParkingDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0903 / CH0780
    (SB0847)
Washington County - Highway Parking - Prohibition on Prolonged Parking of Inoperable or Disabled VehicleDelegate ParrottApproved by the Governor - Chapter 780Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1007
    (SB0883)
Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and RulesDelegate CullisonIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1286
    (SB0614)
State Center - Redevelopment - Requirements, Participation, and ProcessDelegate GlennIn the House - Returned PassedHealth and Government Operations
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB1498 / CH0137Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Social OrganizationDelegate LisantiApproved by the Governor - Chapter 137Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1637Labor and Employment - Parking Cash-Out Program - RequirementDelegate Lewis, R.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0039 / CH0041Motor Vehicle Administration - Disability Parking PlacardsChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 41Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0277 / CH0351
    (HB0372 / CH0352)
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding ActSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 351Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0614
    (HB1286)
State Center - Redevelopment - Requirements, Participation, and ProcessSenator RobinsonIn the Senate - Passed EnrolledEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0847
    (HB0903 / CH0780)
Washington County - Highway Parking - Prohibition on Prolonged Parking of Inoperable or Disabled VehicleWashington County SenatorsIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0883
    (HB1007)
Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and RulesSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:42 A.M.