Parole and Probation

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 24

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0027Correctional Services - Child Pornography Offenders - Diminution Credits and ParoleDelegate ClusterIn the House - Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
1/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0054
    (SB0354)
Criminal Procedure - State Vulnerable-Adult Abuser RegistryDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
1/24/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0424
    (SB0786)
Criminal Procedure - Crimes of Violence Involving Firearms - Diminution Credits, Parole, and Plea AgreementsDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0473Truth in Sentencing Task ForceDelegate SimmonsIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0477Firearms - Conviction for Crime of Violence - Probation Before JudgmentDelegate SimmonsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2013 - 12:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0541
    (SB0571)
Criminal Procedure - Certificate of CompletionDelegate HoughIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0544
    (SB0491)
Criminal Procedure - Supervising Authority - Sex Offender Transfer NotificationsDelegate SerafiniIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0556
    (SB0468)
Vehicle Laws - Misdemeanor Violations - Unsupervised ProbationDelegate AndersonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0921 / CH0652
    (SB0258)
Correctional Services - Inmate Earnings - Compensation for Victims of CrimeDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 652Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1053 / CH0041
    (SB0282 / CH0040)
Video Lottery Facilities - Employee Licenses - Crimes of Moral Turpitude or GamblingDelegate Robinson, B.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41Ways and Means
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB1057
    (SB0865)
Correctional Services - Good Conduct Credits - Firearm Related CrimeDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1063Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Appeal on the Record - Violation of a Condition of ProbationDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1192Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Use of a Firearm in Commission of a CrimeDelegate SmigielIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1267Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities - Sex OffendersDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0258
    (HB0921 / CH0652)
Correctional Services - Inmate Earnings - Compensation for Victims of CrimeSenator ShankVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0282 / CH0040
    (HB1053 / CH0041)
Video Lottery Facilities - Employee Licenses - Crimes of Moral Turpitude or GamblingSenator Jones-RodwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 40Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0354
    (HB0054)
Criminal Procedure - State Vulnerable-Adult Abuser RegistrySenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0403Courts - Violation of Probation - Appeal on the RecordSenator StoneIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0468
    (HB0556)
Vehicle Laws - Misdemeanor Violations - Unsupervised ProbationSenator ForehandIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0491
    (HB0544)
Criminal Procedure - Supervising Authority - Sex Offender Transfer NotificationsSenator ShankIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
SB0571
    (HB0541)
Criminal Procedure - Certificate of RehabilitationSenator ShankIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0786
    (HB0424)
Criminal Procedure - Crimes of Violence Involving Firearms - Diminution Credits, Parole, and Plea AgreementsSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0865
    (HB1057)
Correctional Services - Good Conduct Credits - Firearm Related CrimeSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB1069Criminal Procedure - Issuance of Summonses and Arrest Warrants and Restrictions on Pretrial ReleaseSenator ShankIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.