Parole and Probation

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 21

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0205Drivers' Licenses - Learners' Permits - Minimum DurationDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/9/2017 - 1:15 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0294 / CH0805
    (SB0224 / CH0804)
Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Definition of Convicted of a Disqualifying CrimeDelegate DumaisEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 805Judiciary
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0723
    (SB0694)
Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole ReformDelegate QueenIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0860 / CH0793
    (SB0853 / CH0792)
Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions (Maryland Equal Access to Food Act of 2017)Delegate LiermanEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 793Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB0881Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers, Correctional Officers, and First RespondersDelegate MaloneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0893
    (SB0583)
Juvenile Law - ProbationDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB1157
    (SB0879)
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Pilot Program and ConditionsDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1177Correctional Services - Eligibility for Parole - Controlled Dangerous Substance FelonyDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1392Task Force to Study the Imposition of Life Without the Possibility of Parole for Persons Found Guilty of Murder in the First DegreeDelegate SanchezIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1418Justice Reinvestment Act - ModificationsDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1428Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' CompensationChair, Judiciary CommitteeIn the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 9:30 a.m.Judiciary
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/7/2017 - 9:30 a.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1526 / CH0622
    (SB0934)
Criminal Procedure - Postsentencing - Victim NotificationDelegate AngelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 622Judiciary
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0181Task Force to Study Data Sharing Among the Maryland Judiciary, the Maryland Parole Commission, and the Department of Natural ResourcesSenator SimonaireIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Rules and Executive NominationsNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0224 / CH0804
    (HB0294 / CH0805)
Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Definition of Convicted of a Disqualifying CrimeSenator LeeEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 804Judicial Proceedings
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0583
    (HB0893)
Juvenile Law - ProbationSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0694
    (HB0723)
Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole ReformSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0853 / CH0792
    (HB0860 / CH0793)
Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions (Maryland Equal Access to Food Act of 2017)Senator MadalenoEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 792Finance
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB0879
    (HB1157)
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Pilot Program and ConditionsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0934
    (HB1526 / CH0622)
Criminal Procedure - Postsentencing - Victim NotificationSenator SmithIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0958Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First RespondersSenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1187Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - Repeal of Sentencing ProceedingSenator CassillyIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:57 A.M.