Partnerships

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 15

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0018Task Force to Improve Partnership for Assessment of Readiness for College and Careers Scores for Maryland Public School StudentsDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0308Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A Licenses MC 20-17Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0744 / CH0674
    (SB0481)
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous ProvisionsDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 674Economic Matters
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCorporations and Associations (C1)
HB1044
    (SB0992)
Oncologists - Dispensing and Insurance Coverage of Orally Administered Cancer ChemotherapyDelegate HillIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1062Business Occupations and Professions - Professional Engineers and Professional Land Surveyors - Revisions and Repeal of Firm PermitsDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1184Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - ReductionsDelegate MaloneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
HB1566Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses PG 307-17Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0164Baltimore County - Ethics - Prohibitions and Requirements Regarding Payments During Pendency of Zoning ApplicationsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
SB0481
    (HB0744 / CH0674)
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous ProvisionsSenator FeldmanVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCorporations and Associations (C1)
SB0508Task Force to Study the Feasibility of and Impact on Small and Minority Businesses in Maryland Conducting Business InternationallySenator RobinsonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:30 p.m.Finance
2/21/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0656
    (HB0714)
Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution and Certificates of Cancellation - RepealSenator JenningsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersJudicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCorporations and Associations (C1)
SB0992
    (HB1044)
Oncologists - Dispensing and Insurance Coverage of Orally Administered Cancer ChemotherapySenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0994School Overcrowding Reduction Act of 2017Senator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB1086Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Residency and Registered Voter RequirementsSenator ConwayIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (128-3)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB1194Public Health - Substance Abuse Treatment Outcome Partnership FundSenator KlausmeierIn the House - Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:17 P.M.