Partnerships

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 20

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0018
    (SB0993)
Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution and Certificates of Cancellation - RepealDelegate ClarkIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
1/24/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
HB0195
    (SB0473)
Prince George's County - School Overcrowding Reduction Act of 2018 PG 512-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0448
    (SB0395)
Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages License – Registered Voter RequirementsBaltimore City DelegationIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEconomic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0723Education – Partnership for Assessment of Readiness for College and Careers (PARCC) Assessment – AdministrationDelegate EbersoleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0816Public-Private Partnership Agreements - Compensation Provisions and Noncompete Clauses - AlterationsDelegate LiermanIn the House - Returned PassedEnvironment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1003Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses Issued by Different Local Licensing Boards to Single License Holder - AuthorizedDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Returned PassedEconomic Matters
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB1095
    (SB0865)
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous ProvisionsDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
HB1619Civil Actions - Nonattorney Representation - Corporations, Partnerships, LLCs, and Sole ProprietorshipsDelegate WivellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1641Maryland Transportation Public-Private Partnership Oversight ActDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/9/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1783 / CH0014
    (SB1243)
21st Century School Facilities ActDelegate JonesGubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 14Appropriations
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1804Health – Medical Research FundingDelegate BuschIn the House - Returned PassedAppropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0395
    (HB0448)
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages License - Residency and Registered Voter RequirementsSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Senate Requests House RecedeEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0473
    (HB0195)
Prince George’s County – School Overcrowding Reduction Act of 2018Senator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0865
    (HB1095)
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous ProvisionsSenator FeldmanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersJudicial Proceedings
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCorporations and Associations (C1)
SB0890Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Entities That Provide Paid Sick LeaveSenator SerafiniIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and TaxationTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0993
    (HB0018)
Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution and Certificates of Cancellation - RepealSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
SB0999Recordation Tax - ExemptionsSenator PetersIn the Senate - Returned PassedBudget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
SB1056Rural Health Collaborative PilotSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Returned PassedFinance
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB1236Public-Private Partnerships - Transportation Facility Projects - Environmental Impact StatementChair, PST&E Subcommittee of the Budget & Taxation CommitteeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB1243
    (HB1783 / CH0014)
21st Century School Facilities ActSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:45 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2018 - 1:45 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 12, 2018 1:39 P.M.