Patuxent Institution

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0054
    (SB0354)
Criminal Procedure - State Vulnerable-Adult Abuser RegistryDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
1/24/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0295
    (SB0276 / CH0156)
Death Penalty Repeal and Appropriation from Savings to Aid Survivors of Homicide VictimsSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/14/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0544
    (SB0491)
Criminal Procedure - Supervising Authority - Sex Offender Transfer NotificationsDelegate SerafiniIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1267Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities - Sex OffendersDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0276 / CH0156
    (HB0295)
Death Penalty Repeal - Substitution of Life Without the Possibility of ParolePresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 156Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/8/2013 - 12:30 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0354
    (HB0054)
Criminal Procedure - State Vulnerable-Adult Abuser RegistrySenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0491
    (HB0544)
Criminal Procedure - Supervising Authority - Sex Offender Transfer NotificationsSenator ShankIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.