Pedestrians

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0348
    (SB0041)
Vehicle Laws - Driving While License is Suspended - Prison Sentence RepealDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB1013 / CH0036
    (SB0908)
Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016Delegate BeidleGubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 36Appropriations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0041
    (HB0348)
Vehicle Laws - Driving While License is Suspended - Prison Sentence RepealSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0908
    (HB1013 / CH0036)
Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016Senator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.