Pedestrians

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 15

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0142Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Road User - PenaltiesDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0285 / CH0295Department of Transportation – Pedestrian and Bicycle Access to SchoolsDelegate LuedtkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 295Environment and Transportation
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0372 / CH0352
    (SB0277 / CH0351)
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding ActDelegate KormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 352Appropriations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0535 / CH0721
    (SB0407 / CH0722)
Transportation - Complete Streets Program - EstablishmentDelegate LiermanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 721Environment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0672Vehicle Laws - Intersections - Prohibited ActsDelegate CarrIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0744 / CH0717
    (SB0850 / CH0718)
Transportation - Complete Streets Policy - AdoptionDelegate LaffertyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 717Environment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0959Vehicle Laws - Pedestrian Hybrid BeaconsDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1099
    (SB0868)
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - PenaltiesDelegate LaffertyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1209 / CH0502Public Safety – Missing Persons – Information (Eula and Danny’s Law)Delegate ProctorApproved by the Governor - Chapter 502Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1380State Highway Administration - Access to State Highways - Consideration of Pedestrian, Bicycle, and Public Transportation ActivityDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/9/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB0277 / CH0351
    (HB0372 / CH0352)
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding ActSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 351Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0407 / CH0722
    (HB0535 / CH0721)
Transportation - Complete Streets Program - EstablishmentSenator GuzzoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 722Finance
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationTransportation - Highways (R1)
SB0465Civil Actions - Motor Vehicle Accidents Involving Pedestrians or Nonmotorized Vehicles - Comparative NegligenceSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0850 / CH0718
    (HB0744 / CH0717)
Transportation - Complete Streets Policy - AdoptionSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 718Finance
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationTransportation - Highways (R1)
SB0868
    (HB1099)
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Road User - PenaltiesSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:35 A.M.