Personal Property

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 34

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0157
    (SB0466)
Income Tax - Expensing of Business Property and Bonus DepreciationDelegate BatesIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0291 / CH0465
    (SB0383 / CH0464)
Real Property - Maryland Mortgage Assistance Relief Services ActSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 465Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0419 / CH0370Personal Property Tax - Liens for Unpaid TaxDelegate FrickApproved by the Governor - Chapter 370Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0551 / CH0489
    (SB0506 / CH0488)
Washington County - Technology-Related Businesses - Payment in Lieu of Taxes AgreementsWashington County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 489Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0629Courts - Garnishment of Joint Account - Burden of Proof (Bank Customer Protection Act)Delegate NormanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0713 / CH0636Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Human TraffickingDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 636Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0722Estate Taxes - Qualified Family-Owned Business Property - ExclusionDelegate AfzaliIn the House - Referred to interim study by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0822
    (SB0656 / CH0516)
Calvert County - Property Tax - Natural Gas FacilityCalvert County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 2:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0856Personal Property Tax - Investments in MarylandDelegate FisherIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0857 / CH0644Estates and Trusts - Posthumously Conceived ChildDelegate WaldstreicherApproved by the Governor - Chapter 644Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB0858 / CH0645
    (SB0170)
Estates and Trusts - Modified Administration and Inheritance TaxDelegate WaldstreicherApproved by the Governor - Chapter 645Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB0866Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze AssetsDelegate AroraIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0941 / CH0656
    (SB0770)
Criminal Law - Fraudulent Liens - ProhibitionDelegate AroraApproved by the Governor - Chapter 656Judiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0999Worcester County - Alcoholic BeveragesWorcester County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1127 / CH0303
    (SB0634 / CH0302)
Commercial Law - Self-Service Storage FacilitiesDelegate JamesonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 303Economic Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
HB1130 / CH0541
    (SB0758 / CH0540)
Labor and Employment - Lien for Unpaid Wages - EstablishmentDelegate BarnesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 541Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Finance
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1158Corporate Income Tax - Main Street Employer Tax RebateDelegate MizeurIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1190 / CH0405County Property Tax - Personal Property RateDelegate HixsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 405Ways and Means
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1373Public Utility Property - Operating Personal Property - DefinitionDelegate CarrIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersEconomic MattersTaxes - Property (Q1)
HB1393 / CH0682Public Schools - Student Work Product - Claim of Copyright ProhibitedDelegate O'DonnellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 682Ways and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1455 / CH0687Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreement MC/PG 118-13Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 687Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
SB0170
    (HB0858 / CH0645)
Estates and Trusts - Modified Administration and Inheritance TaxSenator ForehandIn the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0227Tax Sales - Redemption of Property - Taxes, Interest, and PenaltiesSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0251Personal Property Tax - Depreciation of Assessed ValueSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0383 / CH0464
    (HB0291 / CH0465)
Real Property - Maryland Mortgage Assistance Relief Services ActSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 464Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Environmental Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Real Property (N1)
SB0466
    (HB0157)
Income Tax - Expensing of Business Property and Bonus DepreciationSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0506 / CH0488
    (HB0551 / CH0489)
Washington County - Technology-Related Businesses - Payment in Lieu of Taxes AgreementsSenator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 488Budget and Taxation
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0573County Property Tax - Personal Property RateSenator RobeyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0634 / CH0302
    (HB1127 / CH0303)
Commercial Law - Self-Service Storage FacilitiesSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 302Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Generally (I4)
SB0653Sales and Use Tax - Mass TransitSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0656 / CH0516
    (HB0822)
Calvert County - Property Tax - Natural Gas FacilitySenator MillerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 516Budget and Taxation
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0758 / CH0540
    (HB1130 / CH0541)
Labor and Employment - Lien for Unpaid Wages - EstablishmentSenator RamirezApproved by the Governor - Chapter 540Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Economic MattersPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0770
    (HB0941 / CH0656)
Criminal Law - Fraudulent Liens - ProhibitionSenator RaskinIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0780Limited Lines Insurance Licenses - Self-Service Storage AgentsSenator PetersIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.