Personal Property

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 29

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0090 / CH0102Personal Property Tax - Exemption for Low AssessmentsChair, Ways and Means CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 102Ways and Means
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0209Prince George's County - Asset Transfer for Magnetic Levitation Transportation System - Municipal Agreements PG 401-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0232Prince George's County - Asset Transfer for Maglev - Hearing and Approval Requirements PG 402-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0326
    (SB0288)
Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Supervised Drug Consumption Facility ProgramDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0374Personal Property Tax - Exemption for Business Personal PropertyDelegate FisherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0380Personal Property Tax - Investments in MarylandDelegate FisherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0429
    (SB0265)
Anne Arundel County - Personal Property - Possession and ReleaseAnne Arundel County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0587
    (SB0194)
Calculation of Taxable Income - Itemized Deductions - Property TaxesDelegate KrebsIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0596
    (SB0234 / CH0470)
Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure CompactDelegate HillIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0637
    (SB1004)
Counties - Asset Transfer for High-Speed Transportation System - Hearing and Approval RequirementsDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Generally (L1)
HB0638
    (SB1005)
Counties and Municipalities - Asset Transfer for High-Speed Transportation System - AgreementsDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Generally (L1)
HB0789 / CH0073
    (SB0401 / CH0074)
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages License - Suspension Based on Unpaid Personal Property TaxBaltimore City DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 73Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0918Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - ExemptionDelegate FisherIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1007
    (SB0883)
Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and RulesDelegate CullisonIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1051Corporate Income Tax - Throwback RuleDelegate Young, P.In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1237 / CH0322Procurement - Disposition of Property - Public UniversitiesDelegate HayesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 322Health and Government Operations
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1553 / CH0637
    (SB0826 / CH0638)
Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - False Representations and Unlawful EvictionsDelegate AndersonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 637Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1666Small Business Personal Property Tax Relief Act of 2018Delegate MaloneIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0194
    (HB0587)
Calculation of Taxable Income - Itemized Deductions - Property TaxesSenator SerafiniIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0234 / CH0470
    (HB0596)
Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure CompactSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 470Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0265
    (HB0429)
Anne Arundel County - Personal Property - Possession and ReleaseAnne Arundel County SenatorsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/1/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0288
    (HB0326)
Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Supervised Drug Consumption Facility ProgramSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0401 / CH0074
    (HB0789 / CH0073)
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages License - Suspension Based on Unpaid Personal Property TaxSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 74Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0538Corporate Income Tax - Throwback RuleSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0826 / CH0638
    (HB1553 / CH0637)
Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - False Representations and Unlawful EvictionsSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 638Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0883
    (HB1007)
Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and RulesSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0928Prince George’s County – Property Tax Credit – Grocery StoresSenator BensonIn the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB1004
    (HB0637)
Counties - Asset Transfer for High-Speed Transportation System - Hearing and Approval RequirementsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Generally (L1)
SB1005
    (HB0638)
Counties and Municipalities - Asset Transfer for High-Speed Transportation System - AgreementsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Generally (L1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 18, 2018 4:05 P.M.