Personal Representatives

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0256Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets ActDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB0507 / CH0365
    (SB0239 / CH0364)
Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets ActDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 365Health and Government Operations
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB0524Foreclosure - Responsibility for Maintenance of Residential Property and Registration RequirementDelegate ClusterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationReal Property (N1)
HB0644
    (SB0691)
Public Health - Provision of Life-Preserving Health Care Services (Vulnerable Protection Act)Delegate AumannIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0796
    (SB0801)
Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant Law - Actions for Repossession (Fairness and Integrity for Baltimore City Renters Act)Delegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0887 / CH0563Maryland Trust Act - RepresentationDelegate WestApproved by the Governor - Chapter 563Health and Government Operations
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB0920 / CH0396
    (SB0509 / CH0395)
Real Property - Actions to Quiet TitleDelegate O'DonnellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 396Environment and Transportation
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB0947
    (SB0930)
Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording DevicesDelegate SydnorIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB1152Public Health - Final Disposition of Unclaimed Bodies - Authorizing Agent (Nancy's Law)Delegate MieleIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1229
    (SB0913)
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving SpouseDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsHealth and Government Operations
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB1336Estates and Trusts - Notice Requirement - Method of DeliveryDelegate Howard, S.In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0239 / CH0364
    (HB0507 / CH0365)
Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets ActSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 364Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0509 / CH0395
    (HB0920 / CH0396)
Real Property - Actions to Quiet TitleSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 395Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/6/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0691
    (HB0644)
Public Health - Provision of Life-Preserving Health Care Services (Vulnerable Protection Act)Senator BatesIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0801
    (HB0796)
Fairness and Integrity for Baltimore City Renters ActSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0913
    (HB1229)
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving SpouseSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0981Public Health - Copies of Medical Records - FeesSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.