Petitions

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 36

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0112Procurement - Responsible Bidders - Petition by Member of General AssemblyDelegate GrammerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0395
    (SB0423 / CH0602)
Criminal Procedure - Postconviction - DNA Testing and Petition for Writ of Actual InnocenceDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)Judiciary
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0451 / CH0814
    (SB0655)
State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - State Institutions of Higher EducationDelegate JacksonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 814Appropriations
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0499Health - Standards for Involuntary Admissions and Petitions for Emergency Evaluation - ModificationDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0565Criminal Law - Cruelty to Animals - Seizure and RemovalDelegate MoonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0777
    (SB0649)
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving SpouseDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB0891
    (SB0838)
Criminal Procedure - Coram Nobis - Time for FilingDelegate MoonVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Judiciary
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0981 / CH0834
    (SB0875 / CH0833)
Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability ActDelegate Washington, A.Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 834Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB1032
    (SB0684)
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting TimeDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1057Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Denial of Petition Without HearingDelegate SanchezIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)Judiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1082
    (SB0593)
Justice Reinvestment Act - ModificationsDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1152
    (SB0965)
Family Law - Age of Majority - Jurisdiction of CourtDelegate HillIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1219Department of Housing and Community Development - Claims Regarding Neighborhood BlightDelegate GrammerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1302 / CH0250Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective OrdersDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 250Judiciary
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2018 - 11:30 a.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1304Family Law – Minors – Emancipation (Emancipation of Minors Act)Delegate AtterbearyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1335Public Health - Abortions Sought by Minors - Parent or Guardian ConsentDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/9/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1483 / CH0287Duties of a Guardian of the Person - VisitationDelegate SaabApproved by the Governor - Chapter 287Health and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB1513Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Repair Businesses ActDelegate FennellIn the House - Referred to interim study by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)
HB1516
    (SB1002)
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment (Healthy Maryland Act of 2018)Delegate BarronIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/5/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1560Baltimore City Department of Public Works - Water and Sewer Bill Dispute Process, Billing Program Review, and ReportDelegate Washington, M.In the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEnvironment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1735Civil Actions – Name Change Not in Connection With Divorce or AdoptionDelegate McMillanIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0101 / CH0143Criminal Law – Crimes of Violence, Expungement, and Drug TreatmentSenator NormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 143Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0122Criminal Law – Comprehensive Crime Bill of 2018Senator ZirkinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudicial Proceedings
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0423 / CH0602
    (HB0395)
Criminal Procedure - Postconviction - DNA Testing and Petition for Writ of Actual InnocenceSenator ZirkinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 602Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0527Health - Standards for Involuntary Admissions and Petitions for Emergency Evaluation - ModificationSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0593
    (HB1082)
Justice Reinvestment Act - ModificationsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0649
    (HB0777)
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving SpouseSenator KelleyIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0655
    (HB0451 / CH0814)
State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - State Institutions of Higher EducationSenator MathiasIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsState Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0684
    (HB1032)
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting TimeSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0838
    (HB0891)
Criminal Procedure - Coram Nobis - Time for FilingSenator SmithVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0882Procurement - Telecommunication and Computer Network Access - Security RequirementsSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0965
    (HB1152)
Family Law - Age of Majority - Jurisdiction of CourtSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB1002
    (HB1516)
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment (Healthy Maryland Act of 2018)Senator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB1246Criminal Procedure - Partial ExpungementSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1263Public Safety – School Mental Health Services and Mental Disorder Weapon Restraining Order (School Safety Act of 2018: Anticipation)Senator WaughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 11:30 a.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2018 - 11:30 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Public Safety (E4)
SB1268Criminal Procedure - Lifetime Sexual Offender Supervision - Violations and Petitions for DischargeSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:02 P.M.