Pharmacists and Pharmacies

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 32

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0006Criminal Law - Improper Prescription of Controlled Dangerous Substance Resulting in DeathDelegate Young, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0015Harford County - Suspected Overdoses - Reporting RequirementDelegate SzeligaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0117 / CH0475
    (SB0469 / CH0476)
State Board of Pharmacy - Licensure Requirements for Pharmacists - Proof of Proficiency in EnglishDelegate BarronApproved by the Governor - Chapter 475Health and Government Operations
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0404
    (SB0418)
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option ActDelegate PendergrassIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
2/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Public Health (J1)
HB0437 / CH0147
    (SB0537)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - ModificationsDelegate BarronApproved by the Governor - Chapter 147Health and Government Operations
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0456
    (SB0382)
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - RevisionsSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0489 / CH0321Termination of Maryland Health Insurance Plan, Transfer of Senior Prescription Drug Assistance Program, and Funding for State Reinsurance ProgramDelegate HammenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 321Health and Government Operations
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0752 / CH0116
    (SB0647)
Physicians - Prescriptions Written by Physician Assistants or Nurse Practitioners - Preparing and DispensingDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 116Health and Government Operations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0826Prescription Drug Repository Program - Repository Inventory Requirement - RevisionDelegate AdamsIn the House - Hearing cancelledHealth and Government OperationsPublic Health (J1)
HB1005 / CH0437
    (SB0848 / CH0436)
Health Insurance - Contraceptive Equity ActDelegate KellyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 437Health and Government Operations
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB1241Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Contracts With and Reimbursement of PharmacistsDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB1242Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Reimbursement and Pharmacy ChoiceDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB1265
    (SB0857)
Maryland Health Care Commission - Hospital and Physician Financial Arrangement Disclosure - RequirementsDelegate Young, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1267Poly-Morphone-Assisted Treatment Pilot Program - Harm Reduction Act of 2016Delegate MorhaimIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1272
    (SB0886)
Health - Collaborations to Promote Provider AlignmentDelegate PendergrassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB1347Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Managed Care Organizations - DisenrollmentDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1383
    (SB1018)
Health Insurance - Specialty Drugs - Participating PharmaciesDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB1418
    (SB0898)
Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program for Food Service FacilitiesDelegate CullisonIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1462 / CH0688
    (SB0614 / CH0687)
Veterinarians, Pharmacies, and Pharmacists - Dispensing Compounded Preparations for Use by Nonfarm AnimalsDelegate BromwellEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 688Health and Government Operations
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0382
    (HB0456)
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - RevisionsPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0418
    (HB0404)
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option ActSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0469 / CH0476
    (HB0117 / CH0475)
State Board of Pharmacy - Licensure Requirements for Pharmacists - Proof of Proficiency in EnglishSenator McFaddenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 476Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0537
    (HB0437 / CH0147)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - ModificationsSenator KlausmeierVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0614 / CH0687
    (HB1462 / CH0688)
Veterinarians, Pharmacies, and Pharmacists - Dispensing Compounded Preparations for Use by Nonfarm AnimalsSenator ConwayEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 687Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0647
    (HB0752 / CH0116)
Physicians - Prescriptions Written by Physician Assistants or Nurse Practitioners - Preparing and DispensingSenator KlausmeierVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0656Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First RespondersSenator SallingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0806 / CH0700State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors - Establishment of Naturopathic Doctors Formulary Council and Naturopathic FormularySenator PughEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 700Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0848 / CH0436
    (HB1005 / CH0437)
Health Insurance - Contraceptive Equity ActSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 436Finance
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0857
    (HB1265)
Maryland Health Care Commission - Hospital and Physician Financial Arrangement Disclosure - RequirementsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0886
    (HB1272)
Health - Collaborations to Promote Provider AlignmentSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0898
    (HB1418)
Public Health - Auto-Injectable Epinephrine - Certification for Emergency AdministrationSenator KlausmeierIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB1018
    (HB1383)
Health Insurance - Specialty Drugs - Participating PharmaciesSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.