Photography

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0472 / CH0486Estates and Trusts - Registers of Wills - Retention of Estate FilesDelegate MieleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 486Health and Government Operations
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB0494 / CH0267Agriculture - Animal Shelters - Uniform Standards of Operation and Care (Animal Shelters Standards Act of 2016)Delegate MieleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 267Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0947
    (SB0930)
Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording DevicesDelegate SydnorIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0972
    (SB0995 / CH0236)
St. Mary's County - Local Licenses - RepealSt. Mary's County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0035Secondhand Precious Metal Object Dealers and Pawnbrokers - Required Records - Photograph of Precious Metal ObjectSenator ConwayIn the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0115Property Tax Assessments - Inspection of PropertySenator KasemeyerIn the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0764 / CH0229Education - Student Journalists - Freedom of Speech and Freedom of the PressSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 229Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0769Vehicle Laws - Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems and Speed Monitoring Systems - Continuous AuditsSenator BatesIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0880Task Force to Study Welfare Reform in MarylandSenator JenningsIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB0901Public and Nonpublic Schools - Classwork and Assessment Involving Live and Dead Animals - Student Right of RefusalSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0930
    (HB0947)
Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording DevicesSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0995 / CH0236
    (HB0972)
St. Mary's County - Local Licenses - RepealSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 236Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationCounties - Local Laws (L2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.